EP0512616 - Optical scanning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bakx, Johannes Leopoldus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/46] | Representative(s) | Faessen, Louis Marie Hubertus, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | Faessen, Louis Marie Hubertus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 92201206.7 | 04.05.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | EP19910201132 | 10.05.1991 Original published format: EP 91201132 | EP19910201986 | 31.07.1991 Original published format: EP 91201986 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0512616 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0512616 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512616 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
G11B7/0903 (EP,US);
G11B7/094 (EP,US);
G11B7/0941 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/46] | Title | German: | Optische Abtastvorrichtung | [1992/46] | English: | Optical scanning device | [1992/46] | French: | Dispositif de balayage optique | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 13.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP3005927 ; | [A]EP0379285 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 116 (P-1182)20 March 1991 & JP-A-30 05 927 ( SONY CORP ) 11 January 1991, & JP3005927 A 19910111 | Examination | EP0426879 |