EP0502589 - Kit for use in amplifying and detecting nucleic acid sequences [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mullis, Kary Banks 447 Beloit Avenue Kensington, California 94708 / US | 02 /
Arnheim, Norman 22322 De Kalb Woodland Hills, California 91364 / US | 03 /
Saiki, Randall Keichi 320-39th Street Rochmond, California 94805 / US | 04 /
Erlich, Henry Anthony 3936 Rhoda Avenue Oakland, California 94602 / US | 05 /
Horn, Glenn Thomas 169B-11 Btroadmeadow Road Marlborough, Massachussets 07152 / US | 06 /
Scharf, Stephen Joel 2028 Francisco Street Berkeley, California 94709 / US | [1992/51] |
Former [1992/37] | 01 /
Mullis, Kary Banks 447 Beloit Avenue Kensington, California 94708 / US | ||
02 /
Arnheim, Norman 22322 De Kalb Woodland Hills, California 91364 / US | |||
03 /
Saiki, Randall Keichi 320-39th Street Rochmond, California 94805 / US | |||
04 /
Erlich, Henry Anthony 3936 Rhoda Avenue Oakland, California 94602 / US | |||
05 /
Horn, Glenn Thomas 3 Admiral Drive F370 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | |||
06 /
Scharf, Stephen Joel 2028 Francisco Street Berkeley, California 94709 / US | Representative(s) | Jaenichen, Hans-Rainer, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Jaenichen, Hans-Rainer, Dr., et al Vossius & Partner, Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/13] | Notegen, Eric-André Grenzacherstrasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1992/37] | Bizley, Richard Edward Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92201245.5 | 27.03.1986 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | US19850716975 | 28.03.1985 Original published format: US 716975 | US19850791308 | 25.10.1985 Original published format: US 791308 | US19860828144 | 07.02.1986 Original published format: US 828144 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0502589 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0502589 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502589 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, // C07H21/04 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
C12N15/10 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (KR);
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
C07K14/805 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (EP);
C12Q1/6853 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00495 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0059 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
C40B60/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2549/119, C12Q2537/143 (EP);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2549/119, C12Q2525/131 (EP);
C12Q1/686, C12Q2525/131, C12Q2521/513 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/37] | Title | German: | Kit zur Verwendung bei der Amplifizierung und beim Nachweis von Nukleinsäuresequenzen | [1992/37] | English: | Kit for use in amplifying and detecting nucleic acid sequences | [1992/37] | French: | Trousse pour utilisation dans l'amplification et la détection de séquences d'acide nucleique | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 23.03.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 09.09.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 13.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.04.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 02.07.1998 | Appeal received No. T0966/98 | 01.09.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.05.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 03.05.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86302298.4 / EP0200362 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4351901 (BAHL CHANDER P); | [A]EP0086548 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [PA]EP0138242 (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]); | [PA]EP0139501 (BEATRICE CO INC [US]); | [PA]EP0155188 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) | [X] - KLEPPE, K. ET AL, "repair replication of short synthetic DNA's as catalysed by DNA Polymerases", JOURNAL MOLECULAR BIOOLOGY, US, (19710328), vol. 56, pages 341 - 361 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | [X] - PANET A ET AL, "studies on polynucleotides", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., BALTIMORE US, (197408), vol. 249, pages 5213 - 5221 [X] 1-14 * page 5220, column R, paragraph 1 * |