EP0514988 - Fluid composition for compression refrigeration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Arthur Colin 72 Mallings Drive, Bearsted Maidstone, Kent ME14 4HB / GB | 02 /
Koenders, Peter Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
Daegling, Stefan Heukoppel 56 W-2000 Hamburg 71 / DE | [1992/48] | Application number, filing date | 92201424.6 | 18.05.1992 | [1992/48] | Priority number, date | GB19910010837 | 20.05.1991 Original published format: GB 9110837 | [1992/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0514988 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0514988 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514988 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, C10M169/04, C10M105/38 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP);
C10M105/38 (EP);
C10M171/008 (EP);
C09K2205/24 (EP);
C10M2207/281 (EP);
C10M2207/282 (EP);
C10M2207/283 (EP);
C10M2207/286 (EP);
C10M2211/022 (EP);
C10M2211/06 (EP);
C10N2040/00 (EP);
C10N2040/30 (EP);
C10N2040/32 (EP);
C10N2040/34 (EP);
C10N2040/36 (EP);
C10N2040/38 (EP);
C10N2040/40 (EP);
C10N2040/42 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1992/48] | C09K5/04, C10M169/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/48] | Title | German: | Flüssigzusammensetzung für Verdichtungskälteverfahren | [1992/48] | English: | Fluid composition for compression refrigeration | [1992/48] | French: | Composition fluide pour réfrigération par compression | [1992/48] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 06.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.1998
17.06.1998
ADMISSIBLE RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie Überseering 40 D-22297 HAMBURG / DE Opponent's representative Schupfner, Gerhard D., et al, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | 02
23.04.1998
11.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Deutschland GmbH Cognis IP Postfach 130164 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | 03
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US Opponent's representative Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | 04
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Oil Co. Ltd. 3-12, 1-chome Nishi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP Opponent's representative Josif, Albert Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | 05
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE ICI PLC 9 Millbank London SW1P3JF / GB Opponent's representative Geary, Stephen, et al, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.1998
17.06.1998
ADMISSIBLE RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie Überseering 40 D-22297 HAMBURG / DE Opponent's representative Schupfner, Gerhard D., Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Patentanwälte Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 17 53 21236 Buchholz / DE | ||
02
23.04.1998
11.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Deutschland GmbH Cognis IP Postfach 130164 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US Opponent's representative Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
04
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Oil Co. Ltd. 3-12, 1-chome Nishi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP Opponent's representative Josif, Albert Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | |||
05
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE ICI PLC 9 Millbank London SW1P3JF / GB Opponent's representative Geary, Stephen, et al, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | |||
Former [2000/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.1998
17.06.1998
ADMISSIBLE RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie Überseering 40 D-22297 HAMBURG / DE Opponent's representative Schupfner, Gerhard D., Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Patentanwälte Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 17 53 21236 Buchholz / DE | ||
02
23.04.1998
11.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Deutschland GmbH Cognis IP Postfach 130164 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US Opponent's representative Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
04
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Oil Co. Ltd. 3-12, 1-chome Nishi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP Opponent's representative Josif, Albert Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | |||
05
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE ICI PLC 9 Millbank London SW1P3JF / GB Opponent's representative Geary, Stephen, et al, et al Uniqema Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | |||
Former [1998/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.1998
RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie Überseering 40 D-22297 HAMBURG / DE Opponent's representative Schupfner, Gerhard D., et al, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | ||
02
23.04.1998
11.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA TFP / Patente Postfach 1100 D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US Opponent's representative Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
04
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Oil Co. Ltd. 3-12, 1-chome Nishi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP Opponent's representative Josif, Albert Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | |||
05
06.05.1998
19.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE ICI PLC 9 Millbank London SW1P3JF / GB Opponent's representative Geary, Stephen, et al, et al Uniqema Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | |||
Former [1998/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.1998
RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie Überseering 40 D-22297 HAMBURG / DE Opponent's representative Schupfner, Gerhard D., et al, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | ||
02
23.04.1998
11.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA TFP / Patente Postfach 1100 D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
06.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US Opponent's representative Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
04
06.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Oil Co. Ltd. 3-12, 1-chome Nishi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP Opponent's representative Josif, Albert Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | |||
Former [1998/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.1998
RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie Überseering 40 D-22297 HAMBURG / DE Opponent's representative Schupfner, Gerhard D., et al, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | ||
02
23.04.1998
11.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA TFP / Patente Postfach 1100 D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [1998/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.1998
ADMISSIBLE RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie Überseering 40 D-22297 HAMBURG / DE Opponent's representative Schupfner, Gerhard D., et al, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | 13.08.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.01.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 04.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.11.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.11.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/19] | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | 24.07.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 24.07.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.05.2000 | NL | 01.12.2000 | DE | 01.03.2001 | DK | 18.05.2001 | GB | 18.05.2001 | ES | 19.05.2001 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
NL | 01.12.2000 | ||
DE | 01.03.2001 | ||
DK | 18.05.2001 | ||
GB | 18.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
NL | 01.12.2000 | ||
DE | 01.03.2001 | ||
GB | 18.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
NL | 01.12.2000 | ||
DE | 01.03.2001 | ||
Former [2001/22] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
NL | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/19] | NL | 01.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3088892 ; | [XP]EP0430657 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK [JP]); | [XP]EP0468729 (CASTROL LTD [GB]); | [YD]WO9012849 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0415778 ; | [AP]EP0480479 (KYOSEKI SEIHIN GIJUTSU KENK [JP]); | [A]US4175045 (TIMONY PETER E [US]) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 91-153165 & JP-A-3 088 892 (KAO CORP.) 15 April 1991, & JP3088892 A 19910415 |