EP0518416 - Injection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUPHAR INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH B.V C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 1381 CP Weesp / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states DUPHAR INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH B.V C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 NL-1381 CP Weesp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Der Wal, Gillis P. c/o Octrooibureau Zoan B.V., P.O. Box 140 NL-1380 AC Weesp / NL | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Swaters, Pieter D., et al OCTROOIBUREAU ZOAN B.V. P.O. Box 140 1380 AC Weesp / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Swaters, Pieter D., et al OCTROOIBUREAU ZOAN B.V. P.O. Box 140 NL-1380 AC Weesp / NL | Application number, filing date | 92201593.8 | 03.06.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | EP19910201469 | 13.06.1991 Original published format: EP 91201469 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0518416 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
A61M5/2033 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2013 (EP,US);
A61M2005/206 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2073 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3109 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/3202 (EP,US);
A61M5/3204 (EP,US);
A61M5/3213 (EP,US);
A61M5/326 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/51] | Title | German: | Injektionsvorrichtung | [1992/51] | English: | Injection device | [1992/51] | French: | Dispositif d'injection | [1992/51] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/26] | 03.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4378015 (WARDLAW STEPHEN C [US]); | [A]US4445510 (RIGBY RONALD F [US]); | [AD]EP0186916 (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]) |