EP0518438 - A method and a device for the ecological separation, purification and processing of liquid manure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van der Wijngaart, Adriaan Johannes Hubertus Kapelstraat 40 NL-4841 GJ Prinsenbeek / NL | [1992/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Hatzmann, Marinus Jan, et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1996/04] | Hatzmann, Marinus J., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureau Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1994/36] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1994/31] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinkplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1994/03] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1992/51] | Siemens, Andreas Meinhard Ernest Siemens & Cie. Octrooi-en Merkenbureau Roskam 8 NL-4813 GZ Breda / NL | Application number, filing date | 92201684.5 | 10.06.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | NL19910001030 | 14.06.1991 Original published format: NL 9101030 | [1992/51] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0518438 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0518438 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518438 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/01 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
A01K1/0135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur ökologischen Trennung, Reinigung und Verarbeitung von Flüssigmist | [1992/51] | English: | A method and a device for the ecological separation, purification and processing of liquid manure | [1992/51] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la séparation écologique, la purification et le traitement de fumier. | [1993/06] |
Former [1992/51] | Procédé et installation pour la séparation écologique, la purification et le traitement de lisier | Examination procedure | 19.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Request for further processing for: | 28.11.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.12.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.03.1997 | GR | 19.03.1997 | LU | 10.06.1997 | PT | 19.06.1997 | SE | 19.06.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2000/05] | BE | 19.03.1997 | |
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | BE | 19.03.1997 | |
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | BE | 19.03.1997 | |
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | BE | 19.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4227486 (KAUFMAN LYNN E, et al); | [A]NL7903449 (STICHTING INST MECH); | [Y]EP0022596 (ANIMAL BREEDING SYST [NL]); | [E]EP0498084 (ASPERT VAN BEHEER BV [NL]) |