EP0520586 - Dispersants, use thereof, and solids coated therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EFKA-CHEMICALS B.V. Noorderlaan 11 NL-2182 GZ Hillegom / NL | [1993/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quednau, Peter Herman Jac. v.d. Waalsheem 35 2182 ZH Hillegom / NL | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 92201902.1 | 25.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | EP19910201650 | 26.06.1991 Original published format: EP 91201650 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520586 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520586 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01F17/52, C08G18/34, C08G18/38, C08G18/42 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
C08G18/6795 (EP);
C09K23/16 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/283 (EP);
C08G18/284 (EP);
C08G18/4263 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/2815 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/285 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/341 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Dispergiermittel, ihre Verwendung und damit beschichtete Feststoffe | [1993/01] | English: | Dispersants, use thereof, and solids coated therewith | [1993/01] | French: | Agents dispersants, leur utilisation et solides enrobés avec ceux-ci | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 11.09.1996 | GR | 11.09.1996 | PT | 11.12.1996 | SE | 11.12.1996 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | BE | 11.09.1996 | |
DK | 11.09.1996 | ||
PT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/25] | BE | 11.09.1996 | |
PT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | PT | 11.12.1996 | |
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 11.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0018099 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [YD]EP0154678 (BYK CHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP0270126 (BYK CHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]WO8810148 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0311157 (EFKA CHEMICALS BV [NL], et al); | [Y]EP0318999 (BYK CHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US4868277 (CHEN AUGUSTIN T [US]); | [Y]EP0335197 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [XPL]EP0438836 (EFKA CHEMICALS BV [NL]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 74, Nr. 4, 25. Januar 1971, Seite 36, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung Nr. 13947s, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.L. ZAPP et al.: "Isocyanate reactions with difunctional polyisobutylenes", & RUBBER CHEM. TECHNOL. 1970, 43(5), 1154-87 |