EP0532072 - Stone trap for a combine harvester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/11] | Improved stone trap for a combine harvester | ||
[1996/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states FORD NEW HOLLAND N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Herpe, François Morelgem, 76 B-9520 Vlierzele / BE | 02 /
Vermeulen, Antoon G. Baliebrugstraat, 43 B-8020 Ruddervoorde-Oostkamp / BE | 03 /
Jonckheere, Marc R.M. Zomerweg 43 B-8220 Jabbeke / BE | 04 /
Hollevoet, Willy C. Sparappelstraat, 39 B-8820 Torhout / BE | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [1993/11] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic T.J. New Holland Belgium NV., Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 92202353.6 | 30.07.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | GB19910018623 | 30.08.1991 Original published format: GB 9118623 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532072 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532072 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01F12/16 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
A01F12/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/11] | Title | German: | Steinfangmulde für Mähdrescher | [1993/11] | English: | Stone trap for a combine harvester | [1996/39] | French: | Trappe à cailloux pour moissonneuse-batteuse | [1993/11] |
Former [1993/11] | Improved stone trap for a combine harvester | Examination procedure | 15.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 14.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0385146 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [XD]EP0096923 ; | [A]FR2349274 (CLAYSON NV [BE]); | [A]GB1247630 (CLAYSON NV [BE]); | [A]US3576188 (TANIS DALE RICHARD) |