EP0530896 - Polyester/poly(vinylphenol) blends [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Massa, Dennis Jon, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Teegarden, David Morrison, c/o EASTMAN KODAK CO. Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Colby, Ralph Hayes, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Landry, Christine Joanne T., c/o EASTMAN KODAK CO. Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 05 /
Landry, Michael Raymond, c/o EASTMAN KODAK CO. Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 06 /
Long, Timothy Edward, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Aufflick, James Neil, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Aufflick, James Neil, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 92202569.7 | 24.08.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | US19910749821 | 26.08.1991 Original published format: US 749821 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0530896 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0530896 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/00, C08L25/18 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP);
C08L25/18 (EP);
C08L67/025 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/18, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L67/025, C08L23/00 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08L25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/10] | Title | German: | Polyester-Polyvinylphenolmischungen | [1993/10] | English: | Polyester/poly(vinylphenol) blends | [1993/10] | French: | Mélanges de polyester et de polyvinylphénol | [1993/10] | File destroyed: | 03.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/24] | 12.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0319113 ; | [A]DE2505250 ; | [X]JPS59100715 | [X] - DATABASE WPIL Week 8429, Derwent Publications Ltd., LondonGB; AN 84-179912 & JP-A-59 100 715 (TEIJIN KK) 11 June 1984 | [AD] - POLYMER vol. 26, 1985pages 228 - 234 E.J. MOSKALA ET AL. 'Concerning the miscibility of poly(vinylphenol) blends FTi.r. study' |