EP0532089 - N-heteroaryl, N-alkylheteroaryl, N-alkenylheteroaryl & N-alkynylheteroarylmacrolides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ok, Hyun O. 48 Laura Avenue Edison, NJ 08820 / US | 02 /
Goulet, Joung 719 Hanford Place Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 03 /
Sinclair, Peter J. 92 Maple Court Highland Park, NJ 08904 / US | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Barrett, Julie Diane, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Barrett-Major, Julie Diane, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92202659.6 | 02.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | US19910756660 | 09.09.1991 Original published format: US 756660 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532089 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/01, A61K31/70 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
C07H19/01 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/11] | Title | German: | N-Heteroaryl, N-Alkylheteroaryl, N-Alkenylheteroaryl und N-Alkynylheteroarylmakrolide | [1993/11] | English: | N-heteroaryl, N-alkylheteroaryl, N-alkenylheteroaryl & N-alkynylheteroarylmacrolides | [1993/11] | French: | N-Hétéroaryl, N-alkoylhétéroaryl, N-alcenylhétLroaryl et N-alkynylhétéroaryl macrolides | [1993/11] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 29.06.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0428365 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) |