EP0532112 - Magnetic tape cassette apparatus with a drive for magnetic tape cassettes (direction reverse mechanism) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.1995 | Change - withdrawal | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunze, Norbert, c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 W-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE | 02 /
Weber, Georg, c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 W-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1993/11] | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Postfach 10 51 49 D-20035 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92202732.1 | 09.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | DE19914130403 | 13.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4130403 | [1993/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0532112 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0532112 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/44, G11B15/29 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
G11B15/442 (EP,US);
G11B15/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/11] | Title | German: | Magnetbandkassettengerät mit einem Laufwerk für Magnetbandkassetten (Richtungsumkehrmechanismus) | [1993/11] | English: | Magnetic tape cassette apparatus with a drive for magnetic tape cassettes (direction reverse mechanism) | [1993/11] | French: | Appareil à cassette à bande magnétique avec dispositif d'entrainement pour cassette à bande (méchanism d'inversion de sens) | [1993/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 21.09.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0290079 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al); | [XD]DE3617278 (BECKER AUTORADIO [DE]); | [A]EP0295726 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al); | [A]DE2248026 (CLARION CO LTD); | [A]DE3937907 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) |