EP0535734 - Long acting injectable formulations containing hydrogenated castor oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | ||
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Elinor H. 20 Pleasant Place North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | 02 /
Williams, James B. 4 Coventry Drive Freehold, NJ 07728 / US | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92202940.0 | 24.09.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | US19910768797 | 30.09.1991 Original published format: US 768797 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535734 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535734 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/71, A61K47/44, A61K9/00 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K47/44 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/14] | Title | German: | Hydrierte Rizinusöl-enthaltende injizierbare Formulierungen mit verlängerter Wirkstoffabgabe | [1993/14] | English: | Long acting injectable formulations containing hydrogenated castor oil | [1993/14] | French: | Formulations injectables à libération soutenue contenant de l'huile de ricine hydrogénée | [1993/14] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 11.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 29.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Request for further processing for: | 21.03.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2176182 (GLAXO GROUP LTD); | [Y]EP0413538 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) |