EP0524706 - Power transmission system for a two-wheel and four-wheel drive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/04] | Power transmission system for a four-wheel drive motor vehicle | ||
[1996/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Toshio, c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-Chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Maruyama, Keiichi, c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-Chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ohnuki, Yukio, c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-Chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Shindler, Nigel Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Shindler, Nigel BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92203036.6 | 24.07.1989 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | JP19880189792 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18979288 | JP19880189793 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18979388 | JP19880189794 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18979488 | JP19880189795 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18979588 | JP19880189796 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18979688 | JP19880189797 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18979788 | JP19880191146 | 30.07.1988 Original published format: JP 19114688 | JP19880191147 | 30.07.1988 Original published format: JP 19114788 | JP19880242974 | 28.09.1988 Original published format: JP 24297488 | JP19880242975 | 28.09.1988 Original published format: JP 24297588 | [1993/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524706 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524706 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60K23/08, B60K17/35 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
B60K17/35 (EP,US);
B60K23/0808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/04] | Title | German: | Kraftübertragung für ein zwei- und vierradangetriebenes Fahrzeug | [1996/24] | English: | Power transmission system for a two-wheel and four-wheel drive vehicle | [1996/24] | French: | Système de transmission de force pour un véhicule avec entrainement à deux et quatre roues | [1996/24] |
Former [1993/04] | Kraftübertragungssystem für ein vierradgetriebenes Kraftfahrzeug | ||
Former [1993/04] | Power transmission system for a four-wheel drive motor vehicle | ||
Former [1993/04] | Système de transmission de force motrice pour un véhicule avec entraînement à quatre roues | Examination procedure | 16.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 20.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89307479.9 / EP0352994 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Request for further processing for: | 27.08.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.09.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 12.06.1996 | IT | 12.06.1996 | LI | 12.06.1996 | SE | 12.09.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 12.06.1996 | |
IT | 12.06.1996 | ||
LI | 12.06.1996 | ||
SE | 12.09.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | IT | 12.06.1996 | |
SE | 12.09.1996 | ||
CH | 17.09.1996 | ||
LI | 17.09.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 12.06.1996 | |
SE | 12.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | SE | 12.09.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3720168 (TOCHIGI FUJI SANGYO KK [JP]); | [A]US4718302 (NUSSBAUMER ERWIN [DE], et al); | [A]US4741407 (TORII SHUUJI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3642503 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) | Examination | US4048872 | GB2097736 | US4476953 |