EP0525919 - Vibration controlling apparatus for buildings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | For all designated states Fujita, Takafumi 575-28, Nakanokuki Nagareyama-shi Chiba Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujita, Takafumi 575-28, Nakanokuki Nagareyama-shi, Chiba Pref. / JP | |||
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujita, Takafumi 575-28, Nakanokuki Nagareyama Chiba Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suizu, Yoji 12-20-201, Midori-Cho 5-Chome Koganei City, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Masaki, Nobuo 11-83-101, Midori-Cho 2-Chome Tokorozawa City, Saitama Pref. / JP | 03 /
Fujita, Takafumi 575-28, Nakanokuki Nagareyama City, Chiba Pref. / JP | 04 /
Kurabayashi, Hiroshi 3-18, Sangenjaya 2-Chome Setagaya-Ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92203145.5 | 14.10.1988 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | JP19870261239 | 16.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26123987 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0525919 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0525919 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0525919 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/98 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
E02D31/08 (EP,US);
E04H9/0215 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Vibrationskontrolle für Gebäude | [1993/05] | English: | Vibration controlling apparatus for buildings | [1993/05] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de vibrations pour bâtiments | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 10.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88309680.2 / EP0316076 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60211143 ; | [A]JP5997341 ; | [A]JP61165044 ; | [A]US4499694 (BUCKLE IAN G [NZ], et al); | [A]DE2816345 (VKI RHEINHOLD & MAHLA AG); | [A]US4429496 (MASRI SAMI F [US]); | [A]US4635892 (BAKER E BRUCE [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 66 (M-461)(2123) 15 March 1986 & JP-A-60 211 143 ( TOSHIBA K.K. ) 23 October 1985, & JP60211143 A 19851023 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 210 (M-328)(1647) 26 September 1984 & JP-A-59 97 341 ( MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. ) 5 June 1984, & JP5997341 A 19840605 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 372 (M-544)(2429) 11 December 1986 & JP-A-61 165 044 ( KAJIMA CORP. ) 25 July 1986, & JP61165044 A 19860725 |