EP0545448 - Billiard ball box with timer and check on number of returned balls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FAVERO GINO PROGETTAZIONE ELETTRONICA Via R. Lombardi, 64 I-31030 Arcade (Treviso) / IT | [1993/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Favero, Gino Via Montello 70 I-31027 Spresiano (Treviso) / IT | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Paris Bordone 9 31100 Treviso / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Paris Bordone 9 31100 Treviso / IT | ||
Former [1993/23] | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al SAIC BREVETTI s.r.l. Via Paris Bordone 9 I-31100 Treviso / IT | Application number, filing date | 92203233.9 | 21.10.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | IT1991TV00116 | 06.12.1991 Original published format: IT TV910116 | [1993/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545448 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A63D15/00, G07F17/38 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
G07F17/38 (EP);
A63D15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, NL [1993/23] | Title | German: | Billiardballbehälter mit Zeitmesseinrichtung und eine Einrichtung zum Überprüfen der Anzahl der zurückgekehrten Bälle | [1993/23] | English: | Billiard ball box with timer and check on number of returned balls | [1993/23] | French: | Boîte à boules pour billiard avec minuterie et contrôle du nombre des boules retournées | [1993/23] | File destroyed: | 03.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/04] | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.01.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3304439 (DOELP HEINRICH); | [A]DE8800450U ; | [A]DE8901387U ; | [A]DE9013800U ; | [A]DE9110991U |