EP0543447 - Display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1993/21] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Haaren, Johannes Albertus Matthijs Maria c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Blommaert, Franciscus Johannes Josephus c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Verhulst, Antonius Gerardus Hendrikus c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1993/21] | Representative(s) | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 92203457.4 | 11.11.1992 | [1993/21] | Priority number, date | EP19910202999 | 19.11.1991 Original published format: EP 91202999 | [1993/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0543447 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0543447 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0543447 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
G09G1/00 (KR);
G09G3/3607 (EP,US);
G09G3/2074 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/21] | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [1998/24] | English: | Display device | [1993/21] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage | [1993/21] |
Former [1993/21] | Wiedergabeanordnung | Examination procedure | 18.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 10.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.06.1998 | NL | 10.06.1998 | [2003/07] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 10.06.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0361981 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [AP]EP0478043 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |