EP0549026 - Adjusting device with only one handle for the adjustment of office-chairs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.1998 [1998/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lovato, Pietro Via Palladio, 25 I-36070 Trissino (Vicenza) / IT | [1993/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Bettello, Luigi, et al Studio Tecnico Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Bettello, Luigi, Dott. Ing., et al Studio Tecnico Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 92203782.5 | 04.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | IT1991VI00185 | 12.12.1991 Original published format: IT VI910185 | [1993/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549026 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/024, A47C3/30 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
A47C1/03216 (EP);
A47C1/03283 (EP);
A47C3/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/26] | Title | German: | Verstellvorrichtung mit nur einem Handhebel zum Verstellen von Bürostühlen | [1993/26] | English: | Adjusting device with only one handle for the adjustment of office-chairs | [1993/26] | French: | Dispositif de commande à levier unique pour le réglage des chaises de dactylo | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/06] | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1998/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.02.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   08.03.1994 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2321385 (HEROLD WALTER F); | [A]CH563753 (GIRSBERGER AG); | [A]GB2054367 (MORESCHI S & C COFEMO) |