EP0547677 - Use of vapor-phase etching in fabrication of semiconductor-on-insulator structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arst, Margareth, c/o Int.Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1993/25] | Representative(s) | Veerman, Jan Willem, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | Veerman, Jan Willem, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 92203826.0 | 09.12.1992 | [1993/25] | Priority number, date | US19910809465 | 17.12.1991 Original published format: US 809465 | [1993/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0547677 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0547677 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/76, H01L21/306 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
H01L21/76251 (EP);
H01L21/2007 (EP);
H01L21/3065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/25] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer Gasphasen-Ätzung für die Herstellung einer Struktur des SOI-Types | [1993/25] | English: | Use of vapor-phase etching in fabrication of semiconductor-on-insulator structure | [1993/25] | French: | Utilisation d'une attaque en phase vapeur pour la fabrication d'une structure du type SOI | [1993/25] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/03] | 20.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.05.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0488642 (SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI CY) [PX] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]GB1066911 (STANDARD TELEPHONES AND CABLES) [A] 1-4,6-8 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]US4897366 (HARRIS CORP.) [A] 1 * claims 1-6 *; | [A] - T. J.M. KUIJER ET AL., "GAS PHASE ETCHING OF SILICON WITH HCL", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, AMSTERDAM NL, (1974), vol. 22, pages 29 - 33, XP000577105 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(74)90054-2 | [A] - ABE T ET AL, "Wafer thinning without an etchstop down to 0.1 mu m", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002009991 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIRST INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER BONDING: SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY AND APPLICATIONS, PHOENIX, AZ, USA, 13-18 OCT. 1991, 1992, PENNNINGTON, NJ, USA, ELECTROCHEM. SOC, USA, pages 200 - 210 |