EP0546639 - A process for the preparation of bisphenols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meurs, Jan Hermen Hendrik Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
de Jong, Feike Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1993/24] | Application number, filing date | 92203844.3 | 09.12.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | EP19910203275 | 11.12.1991 Original published format: EP 91203275 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546639 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546639 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/18, C07C37/50, C07C39/15, C07C39/17, C07C39/21 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
C07C39/17 (EP);
C07C37/18 (EP);
C07C37/50 (EP);
C07C39/15 (EP);
C07C39/16 (EP);
C07C39/21 (EP);
C07C2601/14 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/18, C07C39/15 (EP);
C07C37/18, C07C39/16 (EP);
C07C37/18, C07C39/17 (EP);
C07C37/18, C07C39/21 (EP);
C07C37/50, C07C39/15 (EP);
C07C37/50, C07C39/16 (EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Bisphenolen | [1993/24] | English: | A process for the preparation of bisphenols | [1993/24] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de bisphénols | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.04.1997 | FR | 09.04.1997 | IT | 09.04.1997 | NL | 09.04.1997 | GB | 09.12.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 09.04.1997 | |
IT | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
FR | 05.09.1997 | ||
GB | 09.12.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 09.04.1997 | |
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
FR | 05.09.1997 | ||
GB | 09.12.1997 | ||
Former [1999/02] | NL | 09.04.1997 | |
FR | 05.09.1997 | ||
GB | 09.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | NL | 09.04.1997 | |
FR | 05.09.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB806014 ; | [XD]DE3527862 ; | [XL]FR90426E ; | [A]US3062896 (DAVIS FRANK C); | [A]EP0013436 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 72, no. 8, 23 February 1970, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 32610b, M.S. OGII ET AL. 'Synthesis of epoxy resins based on condensation products of phenol and bis(chloromethyl) derivatives of aromatic hydrocarbons.' page 34 ;column 2 ; |