Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0546639 | Global Dossier | 09.04.1997 | B1 | EP0546639 | 16.06.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91203275 | 11.12.1991 | EP92203844 | 09.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH05271135 | Global Dossier | 19.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP91203275 | 11.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69218898T | 17.07.1997 | T2 | DE69218898D1 | 15.05.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP91203275 | 11.12.1991 |