EP0553512 - Fume hood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAN SCHAIK EN BERGHUIS B.V. Elandstraat 77 NL-3064 AG Rotterdam / NL | [1993/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goemans, Josephus Hubertus Maria Parkzoom 16 NL-2922 CT Krimpen aan Den Ijssel / NL | 02 /
Heere, Johannes Jan Van der Weijdenlaan 7 Nl-1701 XJ Heerhugowaard / NL | 03 /
Krouwel, Peter Jan Willem Oude Singel 142 NL-2312 RG Leiden / NL | 04 /
Schuffelers, Ingrid Maria Catharina Renee Burg. Meineszlaan 23B NL-3022 BA Rotterdam / NL | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Metman, Karel Johannes, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Metman, Karel Johannes, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O.Box 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 92203908.6 | 14.12.1992 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | NL19920000182 | 31.01.1992 Original published format: NL 9200182 | [1993/31] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0553512 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553512 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B08B15/02 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
B08B15/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, GB, NL, SE [1993/31] | Title | German: | Abzug | [1993/31] | English: | Fume hood | [1993/31] | French: | Hotte d'aspiration | [1993/31] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/43] | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 08.11.1995 | SE | 08.02.1996 | [1998/15] |
Former [1996/30] | SE | 08.02.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2702505 (NELSON LAURENCE N); | [A]US3217630 (KATZFEY JAMES M, et al); | [A]US3218953 (GROW HARRY N, et al); | [Y]GB1183111 (REDIWELD LTD [GB]); | [A]US4150606 (NELSON LAURENCE N [US]) |