EP0506219 - Method for increasing the proportion of a crystalline organic compound which remains uncrystallized in a composite particulate product and suppressing recrystallization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nara Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-7 Jonanjima 2-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states Nara Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-7 Jonanjima 2-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishizaka, Takafumi 23-17, Senzoku 2-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kikuchi, Yuji Doeru Chidori 102, 23-24, Chidori 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Koishi, Masumi Unomori E-403, 30, Unomori Sagamihara, Kanagawa Pref. / JP | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1992/40] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 92250070.7 | 24.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | JP19910086332 | 26.03.1991 Original published format: JP 8633291 | [1992/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0506219 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0506219 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506219 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B05C19/00 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
A61K9/1676 (EP,US);
B01J2/003 (EP,US);
B01J2/10 (KR);
A61K9/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/40] | Title | German: | Methode zur Steigerung des Anteils einer kristallinen organischen Verbindung, die unkristallisiert bleibt, in einem teilchenförmigen Kompositprodukt und Unterdrückung der Rekristallisation | [1992/40] | English: | Method for increasing the proportion of a crystalline organic compound which remains uncrystallized in a composite particulate product and suppressing recrystallization | [1992/40] | French: | Méthode permettant d'accroître la proportion de composé organique cristallin qui reste non cristallisé dans un produit composite particulaire et suppression de la recristallisation | [1992/40] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 25.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0224659 (NARA MACHINERY CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0361910 (MAY & BAKER LTD [GB]) |