EP0513947 - 14 Alpha, 16alpha-ethano- and 14alpha, 16alpha ethenoestratrienes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laurent, Henry, Dr. Glambecker Weg 21 W-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 02 /
Esperling, Peter Furkastrasse 15 C W-1000 Berlin 42 / DE | 03 /
Elger, Walter, Dr. Schorlemer Allee 12 B W-1000 Berlin 33 / DE | 04 /
Krattenmacher, Rolf, Dr. Friedelstrasse 54 W-1000 Berlin 44 / DE | [1992/47] | Application number, filing date | 92250103.6 | 30.04.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | DE19914114635 | 30.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4114635 | [1992/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0513947 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513947 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07J53/00, A61K31/565 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
C07J53/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | 14Alpha,16alpha-Ethano- und 14alpha,16alpha-Ethenoestratriene | [1992/47] | English: | 14 Alpha, 16alpha-ethano- and 14alpha, 16alpha ethenoestratrienes | [1992/47] | French: | 14Alpha, 16alpha-ethano- et 14alpha, 16alpha-etheno-estratriènes | [1992/47] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 30.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.07.1992 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.11.1995 | DK | 15.11.1995 | ES | 15.11.1995 | FR | 15.11.1995 | GB | 15.11.1995 | GR | 15.11.1995 | IT | 15.11.1995 | MC | 15.11.1995 | NL | 15.11.1995 | PT | 15.02.1996 | SE | 15.02.1996 | AT | 30.04.1996 | CH | 30.04.1996 | LI | 30.04.1996 | LU | 30.04.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/18] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
DK | 15.11.1995 | ||
ES | 15.11.1995 | ||
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
GR | 15.11.1995 | ||
IT | 15.11.1995 | ||
MC | 15.11.1995 | ||
NL | 15.11.1995 | ||
PT | 15.02.1996 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [2003/17] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
DK | 15.11.1995 | ||
ES | 15.11.1995 | ||
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
GR | 15.11.1995 | ||
IT | 15.11.1995 | ||
NL | 15.11.1995 | ||
PT | 15.02.1996 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
MC | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [2003/07] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
DK | 15.11.1995 | ||
ES | 15.11.1995 | ||
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
GR | 15.11.1995 | ||
IT | 15.11.1995 | ||
MC | 15.11.1995 | ||
NL | 15.11.1995 | ||
PT | 15.02.1996 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
DK | 15.11.1995 | ||
ES | 15.11.1995 | ||
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
GR | 15.11.1995 | ||
IT | 15.11.1995 | ||
MC | 15.11.1995 | ||
PT | 15.02.1996 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [2001/24] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
DK | 15.11.1995 | ||
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
GR | 15.11.1995 | ||
IT | 15.11.1995 | ||
MC | 15.11.1995 | ||
PT | 15.02.1996 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
DK | 15.11.1995 | ||
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
GR | 15.11.1995 | ||
IT | 15.11.1995 | ||
PT | 15.02.1996 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
DK | 15.11.1995 | ||
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
IT | 15.11.1995 | ||
PT | 15.02.1996 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
DK | 15.11.1995 | ||
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
PT | 15.02.1996 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
PT | 15.02.1996 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/42] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
AT | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
GB | 15.11.1995 | ||
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/37] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
FR | 12.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 15.11.1995 | |
SE | 15.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | SE | 15.02.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8801275 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [A]DE3808679 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [A]EP0372665 (SCHERING AG [DE]) |