Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] |
04.01.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] |
05.10.1994 | First examination report | |
27.08.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] |
08.04.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] |