Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2696633B | Global Dossier | 14.01.1998 | B2 | JPH05132221 | 28.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP35056091 | 05.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0543472 | Global Dossier | 31.01.1996 | B1 | EP0543472 | 26.05.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP35056091 | 05.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69208043T | 30.05.1996 | T2 | DE69208043D1 | 14.03.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP35056091 | 05.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5328162 | 12.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP35056091 | 05.11.1991 |