EP0497442 - Multi-peripheral controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ritz, Terry G. 575 E. Torrey 1122 New Branfels, Texas 78130 / US | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300019.4 | 02.01.1992 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | US19910647606 | 29.01.1991 Original published format: US 647606 | [1992/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0497442 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0497442 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F13/12 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
G06F13/124 (EP);
G06F13/385 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/32] | G06F13/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/32] | Title | German: | Steuereinheit für mehrere Peripheriegeräte | [1992/32] | English: | Multi-peripheral controller | [1992/32] | French: | Unité de commande de plusieurs périphériques | [1992/32] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 13.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/34] | 04.04.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0185098 | [Y] - COMPUTER DESIGN vol. 29, no. 3, 1 February 1990, TULSA, OK, US pages 47 - 60 R. WILSON 'AT chip sets a mixed blessing for embedded computers' | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 33, no. 8, January 1991, ARMONK, NY, US pages 448 - 450 'Multiple interfaces on a single adapter card using bus masters and/or DMA devices' | [Y] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN vol. 33, no. 23, October 1985, HASBROUCK HEIGHTS, NJ, US pages 105 - 111 J. SLATON ET AL 'Controller with SCSI port and on-chip ¶C manages hard disks single-handedly' |