Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0495570
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.03.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] |
12.03.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] |
09.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.10.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.09.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.09.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.05.1998 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] |
06.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.01.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.01.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.08.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.03.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.01.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.11.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.09.1996 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] |
20.09.1996 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] |
19.09.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.07.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.04.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.03.1996 |
First examination report |
|
29.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.03.1995 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] |
30.03.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] |
05.06.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] |