Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5759688 | 02.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US13101393 | 01.10.1993 | US64209791 | 16.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3154537B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2001 | B2 | JPH04316611 | 09.11.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US64209791 | 16.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0495570 | Global Dossier | 28.04.1999 | B1 | EP0495570 | 22.07.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64209791 | 16.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2059255 | 17.07.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64209791 | 16.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69229007T | 21.10.1999 | T2 | DE69229007D1 | 02.06.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US64209791 | 16.01.1991 |