EP0502597 - Cmos output buffer circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naghshineh, Kianoosh 165 E. O'Keefe Street 28 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [1996/41] |
Former [1992/37] | 01 /
Naghshinen, Kianoosh 165 E. O'Keefe Street 28 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | Representative(s) | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300096.2 | 07.01.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | US19910666165 | 07.03.1991 Original published format: US 666165 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0502597 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0502597 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502597 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/003, G11C7/00 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
H03K19/00361 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/37] | G11C7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/37] | Title | German: | CMOS-Ausgangspufferschaltung | [1992/37] | English: | Cmos output buffer circuit | [1992/37] | French: | Circuit tampon de sortie CMOS | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 03.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.10.1996 | BE | 09.10.1996 | CH | 09.10.1996 | DK | 09.10.1996 | ES | 09.10.1996 | FR | 09.10.1996 | GR | 09.10.1996 | IT | 09.10.1996 | LI | 09.10.1996 | NL | 09.10.1996 | PT | 09.01.1997 | SE | 09.01.1997 | LU | 31.01.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
DK | 09.10.1996 | ||
ES | 09.10.1996 | ||
GR | 09.10.1996 | ||
IT | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
NL | 09.10.1996 | ||
PT | 09.01.1997 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
LU | 31.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
DK | 09.10.1996 | ||
ES | 09.10.1996 | ||
GR | 09.10.1996 | ||
IT | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
PT | 09.01.1997 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
LU | 31.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
DK | 09.10.1996 | ||
GR | 09.10.1996 | ||
IT | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
PT | 09.01.1997 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
LU | 31.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
DK | 09.10.1996 | ||
IT | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
PT | 09.01.1997 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
DK | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
PT | 09.01.1997 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
PT | 09.01.1997 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0368524 (NCR CO [US]); | [A]EP0379881 (INTEGRATED DEVICE TECH [US]) |