EP0494756 - Aromatic polyamide oligomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER CO., LTD. 20, Kanda Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER CO., LTD. 20 Kanda Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER CO., LTD. No. 20, Kandanishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosogane, Tadayuki 170-74 Nakada-cho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Hiroshi 347-1 Kamidakeshi, Sakai-machi Sawa-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn High Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300124.2 | 07.01.1992 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | JP19910014007 | 11.01.1991 Original published format: JP 1400791 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0494756 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0494756 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494756 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/67, C08G18/34, C08G69/00, C08F283/04, C07C271/20, C07C233/80, C07D207/452 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
C07D207/452 (EP,US);
C08G18/341 (EP,US);
C08G18/671 (EP,US);
C08G18/6715 (EP,US);
C08G18/6735 (EP,US);
C08G18/6755 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L77/00, C08L79/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/29] | C08G18/67, C08G18/34, C08G69/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/29] | Title | German: | Aromatische Polyamid-Oligomere | [1992/29] | English: | Aromatic polyamide oligomers | [1992/29] | French: | Oligomères de polyamide aromatique | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 06.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.04.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 03.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2258868 ; | [A]US4108810 (BAKER ANN MARIE); | [A]US4110274 (CORBETT JOHN M, et al); | [X]US4187366 (FRIEDLANDER CHARLES B [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 7 9 January 1991 & JP-A-2 258 868 ( SHOWA HIGH POLYMER ) 19 October 1990, & JP2258868 A 19901019 |