EP0509627 - Static sealing device mounted between the inner races of two bearings and a shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1999 | Opposition rejected | published on 14.04.1999 [1999/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TIMKEN COMPANY 1835 Dueber Avenue, S.W. Canton, Ohio 44706 / US | [1992/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otto, Dennis L. 72 West Mohawk Drive Malvern, Ohio 44644 / US | 02 /
Seth, Raj B. 6661 Hythe N.W. Canton, Ohio 44708 / US | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Marles, Alan David, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [1996/42] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | ||
Former [1996/36] | Brooke-Smith, Fred, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | ||
Former [1992/43] | Brooke-Smith, Fred Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300295.0 | 14.01.1992 | [1992/43] | Priority number, date | US19910685039 | 15.04.1991 Original published format: US 685039 | [1992/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0509627 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0509627 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0509627 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16C35/06, F16C33/76 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
F16C19/385 (EP,US);
F16C19/542 (EP,US);
F16C33/60 (EP,US);
F16C33/768 (EP,US);
F16C19/388 (EP,US);
F16C2322/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1992/43] | Title | German: | Statische Dichtung zwischen den Innenringen zweier Wälzlager und einer Welle | [1992/43] | English: | Static sealing device mounted between the inner races of two bearings and a shaft | [1992/43] | French: | Etanchéité statique entre les bagues internes de deux roulements et un arbre | [1992/43] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 28.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 D-97421 Schweinfurt / DE Opponent's representative Glanz, Werner c/o SKF GmbH, Patentabteilung, Gunnar-Wester-Str. 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [1997/31] | 10.07.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.12.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.1998 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.11.1998 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4692040 (EBAUGH ROGER L [US], et al); | [A]FR2412745 (NIPPON SEIKO KK [JP]); | [A]US1840552 (ACKERMAN PAUL C); | [A]US4509607 (SAXMAN WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [A]US3986754 (TORRANT JAMES PETER); | [A]DE3915624 (SKF GMBH [DE]); | [A]US3958847 (CAIN EARL S, et al); | [A]US1783791 (HUGHES FREDERICK G) |