EP0496523 - Sense amplifier circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Toshiyuki, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/31] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300328.9 | 15.01.1992 | [1992/31] | Priority number, date | JP19910005485 | 22.01.1991 Original published format: JP 548591 | [1992/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0496523 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0496523 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0496523 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11C17/12, G11C7/00, G11C7/06 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
G11C17/12 (EP,US);
G11C7/067 (EP,US);
G11C7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1992/31] | Title | German: | Leseverstärkerschaltung | [1992/31] | English: | Sense amplifier circuit | [1992/31] | French: | Circuit d'amplification de détection | [1992/31] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5479527 ; | [YA]US3765002 (BASSE P) [Y] 1-6 * column W * [A] 7-9; | [YA]EP0085767 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-6 * page 4, line 30 - page 8, line 10; figure 1 * [A] 7-9; | [A]EP0383009 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,5 * page 5, line 43 - page 6, line 21; figures 7,8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790829), vol. 3, no. 102, Database accession no. (E - 133), & JP54079527 A 00000000 (TOSHIBA) [A] 9 * abstract * |