EP0502610 - Rotary drill bits and methods of designing such drill bits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMCO DRILLING GROUP LIMITED Hycalog Oldends Lane Industrial Estate Stonehouse Gloucestershire GL10 3RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states CAMCO DRILLING GROUP LIMITED Hycalog Oldends Lane Industrial Estate Stonehouse, Gloucestershire GL10 3RQ / GB | ||
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states CAMCO DRILLING GROUP LIMITED Hycalog, Oldends Lane Industrial Estate Stonehouse, Gloucestershire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Malcolm Roy 9 Kenilworth Avenue Gloucester / GB | 02 /
Keohane, Andrew 34 Church Drive Quedgeley, Gloucestershire / GB | [1997/35] |
Former [1992/37] | 01 /
Taylor, Malcolm Roy 94 Kenilworth Avenue Gloucester / GB | ||
02 /
Keohane, Andrew 34 Church Drive Quedgeley, Gloucestershire / GB | Representative(s) | Carter, Gerald, et al Arthur R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB | [1992/37] | Application number, filing date | 92300809.8 | 30.01.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | GB19910002258 | 01.02.1991 Original published format: GB 9102258 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502610 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502610 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/46 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
E21B10/602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL [1992/37] | Title | German: | Bohrmeissel und Anordnungsverfahren | [1992/37] | English: | Rotary drill bits and methods of designing such drill bits | [1992/37] | French: | Taillants de fleuret et procédé pour la création de tels taillants de fleuret | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.08.1997 | NL | 27.08.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | NL | 27.08.1997 | |
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | FR | 23.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4475606 (CROW MORGAN L [US]); | [A]US4577706 (BARR JOHN D [GB]); | [A]US4738320 (BARDIN CHRISTIAN [FR], et al); | [A]US4942933 (BARR JOHN D [GB], et al); | [A]WO9012191 (WALTON PAUL G [US]) |