EP0498570 - Quantitative measurement of blood flow using cylindrically localized fourier velocity encoding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumoulin, Charles Lucian 36 Terrace Court Ballston Lake, New York 12019 / US | 02 /
Souza, Steven Peter 136 Lindley Terrace Williamstown, Massachusetts 01267 / US | 03 /
Hardy, Christopher Judson 1403 Keyes Avenue Schenectady, New York 12309 / US | 04 /
Ash, Stephen Alan 710 No. 2, Carriage Hill Iowa City, Iowa 52246 / US | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300819.7 | 30.01.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | US19910651872 | 07.02.1991 Original published format: US 651872 | [1992/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0498570 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0498570 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498570 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/026, G01R33/56 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
A61B5/7257 (EP,US);
A61B5/0263 (EP,US);
G01R33/563 (EP,US);
A61B5/7285 (EP,US);
G01R33/446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/33] | Title | German: | Quantitative Messung der Blutdurchströmung bei Anwendung von zylindrisch örtlicher Fourrier-Geschwindigkeitskodierung | [1992/33] | English: | Quantitative measurement of blood flow using cylindrically localized fourier velocity encoding | [1992/33] | French: | Mesure quantitative du flux sanguin utilisant le codage de la vitesse par fourier cylindrique localisé | [1992/33] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.04.1996 | NL | 03.04.1996 | DE | 04.07.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | NL | 03.04.1996 | |
DE | 04.07.1996 | ||
FR | 30.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | DE | 04.07.1996 | |
FR | 30.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | DE | 04.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4947120 (FRANK LAWRENCE R [US]); | [AP]EP0412819 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [AD] - RADIOLOGY, vol. 159, no. 1, April 1986, pages 195 - 199 K.SHIMIZU ET AL '"Visualation of moving fluid: | [AD] - MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, no. 2, 1985, NEW YORK,US, pages 555 - 566 D.A.FEINBERG ET AL '"Magnetic resonance imaging the velocity vector components of fluid flow"' | | [AD] - RADIOLOGY, vol. 166, no. 1, January 1988, pages 237 - 240 J.HENNIG ET AL '" Quantitative flow measurement with the fast fourier flow technique"' | |