EP0498636 - Cosmetic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeneca Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | ||
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Austin, Peter William 45 Randale Drive Bury, Lancs BL9 8NF / GB | 02 /
Singer, Michael 17 Ramilies Avenue Cheadle Hulme, Cheadle, Cheshire Sk8 AQ / GB | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Pugsley, Roger Graham, et al Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | Pugsley, Roger Graham, et al Intellectual Property Group Zeneca Specialties P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | ||
Former [1992/33] | Pugsley, Roger Graham ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300971.6 | 05.02.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | GB19910002412 | 05.02.1991 Original published format: GB 9102412 | [1992/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0498636 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498636 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/06 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
A61K8/49 (EP);
A61K8/30 (KR);
A61K8/27 (EP);
A61K8/46 (EP);
A61K8/4913 (EP);
A61K8/4933 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (KR);
A61Q17/005 (EP);
A61K2800/58 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/33] | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung | [1992/33] | English: | Cosmetic composition | [1992/33] | French: | Composition cosmétique | [1992/33] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 20.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2446555 (VANDERBILT CO R T); | [XD]EP0249328 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [XD]EP0392648 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [XD]EP0409617 (ICI PLC [GB]) |