EP0507436 - Journal bearing arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pagluica, Gino 225 Vernon Street Manchester, Connecticut 06040 / US | 02 /
Sundt, Cornelius V. 27 Parkwood Drive Windsor, Connecticut 06095 / US | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300977.3 | 05.02.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | US19910674267 | 25.03.1991 Original published format: US 674267 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0507436 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0507436 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/28 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
F16H57/0482 (EP,US);
F16C23/04 (EP,US);
F16H1/2836 (EP,US);
F16H57/082 (EP,US);
F16C17/02 (EP,US);
F16H2057/085 (EP,US);
F16H57/0479 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/41] | Title | German: | Traglagereinheit | [1992/41] | English: | Journal bearing arrangement | [1992/41] | French: | Palier de tourillon | [1992/41] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2127463 (ROLAND CHILTON); | [A]DE3325781 (RENK AG ZAHNRAEDER [DE]); | [A]EP0003894 (HICKS TRANSMISSIONS LTD R J [GB]) |