EP0499411 - Method of making a metal substrate having a superconducting layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1992/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jin, Sungho 145 Skyline Drive Millington, New Jersey 07946 / US | 02 /
Tiefel, Thomas Henry 758 Taft Avenue North Plainfield, New Jersey 07060 / US | [1992/34] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301023.5 | 06.02.1992 | [1992/34] | Priority number, date | US19910656354 | 15.02.1991 Original published format: US 656354 | [1992/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499411 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0499411 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01B12/00, H01L39/24 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
H10N60/0352 (EP,US);
H10N60/0801 (EP,US);
Y10S505/704 (EP,US);
Y10S505/733 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines metallischen Trägers mit einer supraleitenden Schicht | [1992/34] | English: | Method of making a metal substrate having a superconducting layer | [1992/34] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer un substrat métallique ayant une couche supraconductrice | [1992/34] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 22.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02279507 (CHODENDO HATSUDEN KANREN KIKI) |