EP0500306 - Orthogonal transformation encoder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishino, Masakazu 4-26, Kamiichi-1-chome Kashiwara-shi / JP | 02 /
Juri, Tatsuro 5-8-2804 Tomobuchicho-1-chome Miyakojima-ku, Osaka-shi / JP | 03 /
Horikane, Hiroshi 574-20, Kamishimagashira Kadoma-shi / JP | 04 /
Hidaka, Iwao 8-3, Morigawachi Higashi-2-chome Higashiosaka-shi / JP | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301298.3 | 18.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | JP19910027284 | 21.02.1991 Original published format: JP 2728491 | JP19910030562 | 26.02.1991 Original published format: JP 3056291 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0500306 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0500306 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500306 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/30 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
H04N19/18 (EP,US);
G11B20/08 (KR);
H04N19/112 (EP,US);
H04N19/126 (EP,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,US);
H04N19/154 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/35] | H04N7/133 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/35] | Title | German: | Orthogonaltransformationskodierer | [1992/35] | English: | Orthogonal transformation encoder | [1992/35] | French: | Codeur à transformation orthogonale | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/26] | 28.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Request for further processing for: | 10.03.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4849812 (BORGERS STEPHANUS M C [NL], et al); | [Y]EP0366435 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0412713 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | [Y] - ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN vol. 72, no. 5, May 1989, NEW YORK US pages 1 - 9 KATO ET AL. 'An Adaptive Orthogonal Transform Coding Algorithm for Images Utilizing Classification Technique' |