EP0500308 - Olefin polymerization catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2000 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): CH, LI | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | ||
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states SHELL OIL COMPANY 900, Louisiana Street Houston Texas 77002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Job, Robert Charles 12126 Westmere Street Houston, Texas 77077 / US | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1995/31] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1992/35] | Myerscough, Philip Boyd J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301300.7 | 18.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | US19910657036 | 19.02.1991 Original published format: US 657036 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0500308 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0500308 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500308 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/654, C08F4/655 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6548 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/35] | C08F4/656, C08F10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/35] | Title | German: | Olefinpolymerisationskatalysator | [1997/03] | English: | Olefin polymerization catalyst | [1992/35] | French: | Catalyseur de polymérisation d'oléfines | [1992/35] |
Former [1992/35] | Glefienpolymerisationskatalysator | Examination procedure | 04.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.01.1997 | DK | 15.01.1997 | LI | 15.01.1997 | LU | 28.02.1997 | NL | 01.09.1997 | [2000/52] |
Former [2000/50] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
LU | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 21.04.1997 | ||
LI | 21.04.1997 | ||
NL | 01.09.1997 | ||
Former [2000/07] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
LU | 28.02.1997 | ||
NL | 01.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
NL | 01.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | NL | 01.09.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1464451 (CHUBU CHEM INC); | [A]EP0072035 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US4525554 (TANAKA TORU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0322938 (SOLVAY [BE]) |