EP0500327 - Image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isemura, Keizo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshihara, Kunio, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ichikawa, Hiroyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sakai, Masanori, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Tanabe, Masatoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Nimura, Mitsuo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Funamizu, Yoshihiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Kishimoto, Hirohiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301333.8 | 19.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | JP19910047667 | 20.02.1991 Original published format: JP 4766791 | JP19910153938 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15393891 | JP19910153939 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15393991 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0500327 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0500327 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500327 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
H04N1/40012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/35] | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsgerät | [1992/35] | English: | Image processing apparatus | [1992/35] | French: | Appareil pour la traitement d'images | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 26.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98200211.5 / EP0860988 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0199272 (WANG LABORATORIES [US]); | [X]DE3802736 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al); | [XD]US4369461 (TAMURA YASUYUKI [JP]); | [X]WO8801778 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ POLARAD INC [US]); | [X]WO8903108 (FANUC LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P section, vol. 14, no. 27, January 19, 1990 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 123 P 992 |