EP0500361 - Compatible polymeric blends [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harvey, Noel Gray 120 Highland Avenue North Wales, Pennsylvania 19454 / US | 02 /
Bortnick, Newman Mayer 509 Oreland Mill Road Oreland, Pennsylvania 19075 / US | 03 /
Hallden-Abberton, Michael Paul 964 Whitney Lane Maple Glen, Pennsylvania 19002 / US | 04 /
Queenan, Robin Bepler 1225 Hunt Club Lane Media, Pennsylvania 19063 / US | 05 /
Goldman, Theodore Daniel 1290 General DeFermoy Road Washington's Crossing, PA 18977 / US | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301394.0 | 20.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | US19910658929 | 21.02.1991 Original published format: US 658929 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0500361 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0500361 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/24, C08L101/00, C08L33/02, // (C08L33/24, 101:00, 101:00),(C08L101/00, 51:00),(C08L101/00, 87:00),(C08L33/02, 101:00, 101:00) | [1993/07] | CPC: |
C08L33/02 (EP);
C08L33/12 (KR);
C08L101/00 (EP);
C08L2205/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L33/02, C08L2666/02 (EP) |
Former IPC [1992/35] | C08L33/24, C08L101/00, // (C08L33/24, 101:00, 101:00),(C08L101/00, 51:00),(C08L101/00, 87:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/35] | Title | German: | Verträgliche Polymermischungen | [1992/35] | English: | Compatible polymeric blends | [1992/35] | French: | Mélanges de polymères compatibles | [1992/35] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 05.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 01.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/09] | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP1060647 ; | [A]JP59025836 ; | [XD]EP0332454 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) | [X] - DATABASE WPIL Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 89-112294 & JP-A-1 060 647 (TORAY IND INC) 7 March 1989, & JP1060647 A 19890307 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 84-071654 & JP-A-59 025 836 (TORAY IND INC) 9 February 1984, & JP59025836 A 19840209 |