EP0506229 - Silver halide photographic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawashima, Yasuhiko c/o Konica Corporation, No. 1, Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP | 02 /
Yamauchi, Reiko c/o Konica Corporation, No. 1, Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301498.9 | 24.02.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | JP19910061931 | 26.03.1991 Original published format: JP 6193191 | [1992/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506229 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/83, C09B23/02 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
C09B23/02 (EP,US);
G03C1/832 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/40] | Title | German: | Photographische Silberhalogenidmaterialen | [1992/40] | English: | Silver halide photographic materials | [1992/40] | French: | Matériaux photographiques à halogénure d'argent | [1992/40] | File destroyed: | 28.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/02] | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 16.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0361949 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [AD]US4833246 (ADACHI KEIICHI [JP], et al); | [A]JPS5938742 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8no. 137 (P-282)(1574) 26 June 1984 & JP-A-59 038 742 ( KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO KK ) 2 March 1984 |