EP0501811 - Dynamically balanced, differential gas adsorption apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): MC | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROMERITICS INSTRUMENT CORPORATION One Micromeritics Drive Norcross Georgia 30093 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states MICROMERITICS INSTRUMENT CORPORATION One Micromeritics Drive Norcross Georgia 30093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Camp, Ronnie W. 3001 Bunten Road Duluth, Georgia 30136 / US | 02 /
Conklin William B. 5248 Cold Springs Drive Lilburn, Georgia 30247 / US | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Chettle, Adrian John Withers & Rogers 4, Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301688.5 | 28.02.1992 | [1992/36] | Priority number, date | US19910662284 | 28.02.1991 Original published format: US 662284 | [1992/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0501811 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0501811 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/08 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
G01N15/0893 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/36] | Title | German: | Differentielles Gasadsorptionsgerät mit dynamischem Gleichgewicht | [1992/36] | English: | Dynamically balanced, differential gas adsorption apparatus | [1992/36] | French: | Appareil d'adsorption différentielle de gaz à équilibrage dynamique | [1992/36] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 13.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.1995 | BE | 02.11.1995 | CH | 02.11.1995 | DK | 02.11.1995 | ES | 02.11.1995 | GR | 02.11.1995 | IT | 02.11.1995 | LI | 02.11.1995 | MC | 02.11.1995 | PT | 02.02.1996 | SE | 02.02.1996 | LU | 29.02.1996 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | AT | 02.11.1995 | |
BE | 02.11.1995 | ||
CH | 02.11.1995 | ||
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
ES | 02.11.1995 | ||
GR | 02.11.1995 | ||
IT | 02.11.1995 | ||
LI | 02.11.1995 | ||
PT | 02.02.1996 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
MC | 28.02.1996 | ||
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 02.11.1995 | |
BE | 02.11.1995 | ||
CH | 02.11.1995 | ||
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
ES | 02.11.1995 | ||
GR | 02.11.1995 | ||
IT | 02.11.1995 | ||
LI | 02.11.1995 | ||
MC | 02.11.1995 | ||
PT | 02.02.1996 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 02.11.1995 | |
BE | 02.11.1995 | ||
CH | 02.11.1995 | ||
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
GR | 02.11.1995 | ||
IT | 02.11.1995 | ||
LI | 02.11.1995 | ||
MC | 02.11.1995 | ||
PT | 02.02.1996 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 02.11.1995 | |
BE | 02.11.1995 | ||
CH | 02.11.1995 | ||
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
GR | 02.11.1995 | ||
IT | 02.11.1995 | ||
LI | 02.11.1995 | ||
PT | 02.02.1996 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.11.1995 | |
BE | 02.11.1995 | ||
CH | 02.11.1995 | ||
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
IT | 02.11.1995 | ||
LI | 02.11.1995 | ||
PT | 02.02.1996 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.11.1995 | |
BE | 02.11.1995 | ||
CH | 02.11.1995 | ||
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
LI | 02.11.1995 | ||
PT | 02.02.1996 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT | 02.11.1995 | |
BE | 02.11.1995 | ||
CH | 02.11.1995 | ||
LI | 02.11.1995 | ||
PT | 02.02.1996 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 02.11.1995 | |
BE | 02.11.1995 | ||
CH | 02.11.1995 | ||
LI | 02.11.1995 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | AT | 02.11.1995 | |
BE | 02.11.1995 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | AT | 02.11.1995 | |
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 02.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3059478 (COGGESHALL NORMAN D, et al); | [A]US3211006 (HALEY JR ALFRED J); | [AD]US3850040 (CAMP R, et al); | [A]EP0127514 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]); | [A]US4489593 (PIETERS WIM J M [US], et al) |