EP0501820 - Extendible telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8436 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | |||
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Hitoshi, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Masataka, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ohno, Masataka, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Kazuyoshi 94-2-6-204, Nagasawa, Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Nakamura, Hiromitsu 3-9-3907, Shiomidai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301719.8 | 28.02.1992 | [1992/36] | Priority number, date | JP19910057855 | 28.02.1991 Original published format: JP 5785591 | [1992/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0501820 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0501820 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0501820 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04M1/03 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
H04M1/0237 (EP,US);
H04M1/00 (KR);
H04M1/0202 (EP,US);
H04M1/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/36] | Title | German: | Ausziehbares Telefongehäuse | [1992/36] | English: | Extendible telephone | [1992/36] | French: | Carter de téléphone extensible | [1992/36] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 15.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3836406 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |