EP0502672 - Improved vehicle lamp assembly and method for molding same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hettinga, Siebolt 2123 N.W. 111th Street Des Moines Iowa 50325 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states Hettinga, Siebolt 2123 N.W. 111th Street Des Moines Iowa 50325 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Singleton, Jeffrey, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Singleton, Jeffrey, et al Eric Potter Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301750.3 | 28.02.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | US19910664224 | 04.03.1991 Original published format: US 664224 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0502672 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0502672 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/16, B29C45/14, F21Q1/00 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B29C45/14 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/14508 (EP,US);
F21S43/255 (EP,US);
F21S43/26 (EP,US);
B29L2011/0016 (EP,US);
B29L2031/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/37] | B29C45/14, F21Q1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1992/37] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugleuchte und Verfahren zum Formen derselben | [1992/37] | English: | Improved vehicle lamp assembly and method for molding same | [1992/37] | French: | Feu pour véhicule et son procédé de moulage | [1992/37] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/27] | 09.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63270123 ; | [X]FR2172128 (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER [DE]); | [X]FR2301357 (FRANKANI SA [FR]); | [A]EP0089675 (FRANKANI SA [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 67 (M-798)(3415) 15 February 1989 & JP-A-63 270 123 ( NIKON CORP ), & JP63270123 A 19890215 |