EP0503824 - Apparatus for mixing and dispensing a multicomponent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning France S.A. Route des Cretes BP 43 Sophia Antipolis Les Bouillides F-06561 Valbonne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states Dow Corning France S.A. Route des Cretes BP 43 Sophia Antipolis Les Bouillides F-06561 Valbonne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouquet, Philippe Louis 42 Impasse Bellon F-06370 Mouans-Sartoux / FR | 02 /
Pocknell, David 23 Whittan Close, Court Farm Estate Rhoose, South Glamorgan, Wales / GB | 03 /
Bruning, Werner Am Himmelchen 9 W-5250 Engelskirchen / DE | 04 /
Dittrich-Duster, Martina Cronenburg 16A W-5250 Engelskirchen / DE | 05 /
Lamers, Gunter Brandenburger Strasse 4 W-5250 Engelskirchen / DE | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Bullows, Michael Dow Corning Limited, Cardiff Road Barry, South Glamorgan CF63 7YL Wales / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Bullows, Michael Dow Corning Limited, Cardiff Road Barry, South Glamorgan CF63 7YL, Wales / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301831.1 | 04.03.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | FR19910003016 | 13.03.1991 Original published format: FR 9103016 | [1992/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0503824 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0503824 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503824 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61L25/00, C08J9/02, B65D81/32, B65D83/14, D65D83/76 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
C08J9/02 (EP,US);
A61C5/64 (EP,US);
A61C9/0026 (EP,US);
A61L26/0019 (EP,US);
A61L26/0085 (EP,US);
B65D81/325 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L26/0019, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/34 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1992/38] | A61L25/00, C08J9/02, B65D81/32, B65D83/14, B65D83/76 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Mengen und Abgeben von einer Mehrkomponentenzusammensetzung | [1992/38] | English: | Apparatus for mixing and dispensing a multicomponent composition | [1992/38] | French: | Dispositif mélangeur et distributeur pour une composition à plusieurs composants | [1992/38] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.08.1997 | IT | 27.08.1997 | DE | 28.11.1997 | GB | 04.03.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 27.08.1997 | |
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
GB | 04.03.1998 | ||
Former [1999/25] | DE | 28.11.1997 | |
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
GB | 04.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | DE | 28.11.1997 | |
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DE | 28.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2412475 (HACHE CLAUDE [FR]); | [A]EP0124852 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]FR2589737 (DOW CORNING SA [FR]); | [A]FR2589832 (DOW CORNING SA [FR]); | [A]EP0223409 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [X]EP0330723 (RATHOR AG [CH]) |