EP0502739 - NRZ clock and data recovery system employing phase lock loop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Grass Valley Group, Inc. 13024 Bitney Springs Road Nevada City California 95959 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states The Grass Valley Group, Inc. 13024 Bitney Springs Road Nevada City California 95959 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hershberger, David L. 10373 Pine Flat Way Nevada City, California 95959 / US | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Langner Parry 1-2 Bolt Court London EC4A 3DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al LANGNER PARRY 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | ||
Former [1992/37] | Molyneaux, Martyn William c/o Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92301912.9 | 05.03.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | US19910665861 | 07.03.1991 Original published format: US 665861 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0502739 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0502739 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502739 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/033 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
H03L7/089 (EP,US);
G11B20/1419 (EP,US);
H03L7/087 (EP,US);
H03M5/14 (EP,US);
H04L7/0087 (EP,US);
H04L7/033 (EP,US);
Y10S331/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/37] | G11B20/14, G11B20/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1992/37] | Title | German: | System zur Rückgewinnung von Daten und NRZ-Taktsignalen mit einer Phasenregelschleife | [1992/37] | English: | NRZ clock and data recovery system employing phase lock loop | [1992/37] | French: | Système de récupération de données et d'horloge NRZ utilisant une boucle à verrouillage de phase | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.04.1999 | FR | 28.04.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 28.04.1999 | |
FR | 24.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | FR | 24.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE4019976 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0009939 (SPERRY RAND CORP [US]); | [Y]US4590602 (WOLAVER DAN H [US]); | [A]US3992581 (DAVIS WILLIAM W); | [A]FR1355134 (IBM); | [A]US3982190 (SCHAEFER DIETRICH H); | [E]US5127026 (KELLY RICHARD J [US], et al) | [A] - NTC 1979 vol. 1, 27 November 1979, WASHINGTON , US pages 14.4.1 - 14.4.5 J.A. AFONSO ET AL. 'A PHASE-LOCKED LOOP WITH DIGITAL FREQUENCY COMPARATOR FOR TIMING SIGNAL RECOVERY' | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. vol. 23, no. 22, 22 October 1987, STEVENAGE GB pages 1203 - 1204 GANGOPADHYAY 'DATA CLOCK JITTER IN SUPERSAMPLING MULTIPLEX TRANSMISSION' |