EP0508591 - Lipstick composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.06.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOLMAR LABORATORIES INC. 18th Floor, Suite 1800, One Blue Hill Plaza Pearl River New York 10965 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states KOLMAR LABORATORIES INC. 18th Floor, Suite 1800, One Blue Hill Plaza Pearl River, New York 10965 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Christopher G. 162 West Main Street Port Jervis, New York 12771 / US | 02 /
Berg, Richard D. R.R. 1, Box 2443 Milford, Pennsylvania 18337 / US | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead, Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Brown, David Leslie, et al Page Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol BS1 6PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301948.3 | 06.03.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | US19910667802 | 11.03.1991 Original published format: US 667802 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0508591 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0508591 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/027, A61K7/48 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
A61Q1/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/602 (EP,US);
Y10S424/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1992/42] | Title | German: | Lippenstift | [1992/42] | English: | Lipstick composition | [1992/42] | French: | Rouge à lèvres | [1992/42] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.02.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/33] | 17.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4894222 ; | [A]JP2083309 | [A] - STN, FILE SUPPLIER, KARLSRUHE DE, FILE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 113, no. 6, abstract no. 46112t, Columbus, Ohio, US; & US-A-4 894 222 (P. MATRAVERS) 16-01-1990, & US4894222 A 00000000 | [A] - STN, FILE SUPPLIER, KARLSRUHE DE, FILE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 113, no. 14, abstract no. 120626g, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-2 083 309 (KANEBO LTD) 23-03-1990, & JP2083309 A 00000000 |