Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0508597
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
18.09.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.11.1998 [1998/45] |
26.09.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] |
07.08.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.04.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.04.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.03.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.12.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.10.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.06.1996 |
First examination report |
|
19.06.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.04.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.11.1993 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] |
12.11.1993 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] |
06.10.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] |
30.09.1993 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] |
28.08.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] |
28.08.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] |