Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2853717B | Global Dossier | 03.02.1999 | B2 | JPH05114888 | 07.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP10327891 | 08.03.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2853716B | Global Dossier | 03.02.1999 | B2 | JPH04297144 | 21.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP10327791 | 08.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0508597 | Global Dossier | 12.11.1997 | B1 | EP0508597 | 24.11.1993 | A3 | EP0508597 | 14.10.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP10327791 | 08.03.1991 | JP10327891 | 08.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5334977 | 02.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP10327791 | 08.03.1991 | JP10327891 | 08.03.1991 |