EP0505142 - A method and apparatus for rendering a three-dimensional object on a two-dimensional display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koide, Akio No 2 Hiruzu 303, 2-3-22 Miyamaedaira, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1992/39] | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302279.2 | 17.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | JP19910077312 | 18.03.1991 Original published format: JP 7731291 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0505142 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0505142 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505142 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
G06T15/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/39] | G06F15/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Darstellung eines dreidimensionalen Objektes auf einer zweidimensionalen Anzeige | [1992/39] | English: | A method and apparatus for rendering a three-dimensional object on a two-dimensional display | [1992/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour représenter une image à trois dimensions sur un affichage à deux dimensions | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.10.1996 | IT | 23.10.1996 | DE | 24.01.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 23.10.1996 | |
DE | 24.01.1997 | ||
FR | 21.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | DE | 24.01.1997 | |
FR | 21.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | DE | 24.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2933573 (LUEG) [A] 1,8 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 22 * | [DA] - BASH ET AL, "Van der Waals Surfaces in Molecular Modeling", SCIENCE, LANCASTER, PA US, (1983), vol. 222, pages 1325 - 1327 [DA] 1-3,6,8,9 * the whole document * | [A] - MAX ET AL, "Spherical Harmonic Molecular Surfaces", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, NEW YORK US, (198807), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 42 - 50 [A] 1,8 * page 43, column L, line 39 - column R, line 46; figure 4 * | [A] - "Visualization of molecular structures under the graPHIGS API V2 environment at IBM 6090 and risc system/6000 workstations", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (199103), vol. 33, no. 10A, pages 92 - 93 [A] 1-3,8,9 * the whole document * |